This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 06:46:23 (UTC).

Tarik Fellah v. Daniel Cregan

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 Tarik Fellah filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Daniel Cregan. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Norma Ruiz and Laura G Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Norma Ruiz

Laura G Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tarik Fellah

Defendant

Daniel Cregan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGUIRE, RONALD BRIAN

Attorney at Ronald B. McGuire, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

CETRON, DAVID B

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID B. CETRON, PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) STIPULATON TO ADJOURN CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) STIPULATON TO ADJOURN CONFERENCE; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stip to adjourn

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stip to adjourn; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/9/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/9/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stip adjorning Motion

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stip adjorning Motion; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Civil Document list

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Civil Document list; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Case Details

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Case Details; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Emails Between Counsel With Stipulations

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Emails Between Counsel With Stipulations; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) WebCriminal Case Information

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) WebCriminal Case Information; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Indictment

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Indictment; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Court Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Court Complaint; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Aff. of D. Cetron in support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Aff. of D. Cetron in support; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion pursuant to CPLR 2201 and 2004

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion pursuant to CPLR 2201 and 2004; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of Summons, Complaint and Notice of electronic Filing on Defendant Daniel Cre(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of Summons, Complaint and Notice of electronic Filing on Defendant Daniel Cre(..); Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 06/23/2019; Received: 06/23/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) STIPULATON TO ADJOURN CONFERENCE; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stip to adjourn; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 03/09/2020; Received: 03/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/9/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stip adjorning Motion; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/20/2019; Received: 09/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Civil Document list; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Case Details; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 09/18/2019; Received: 09/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #001) Emails Between Counsel With Stipulations; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on City University; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) WebCriminal Case Information; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Indictment; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Criminal Court Complaint; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Aff. of D. Cetron in support; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion pursuant to CPLR 2201 and 2004; Filed By: Cetron, D.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service of Summons, Complaint and Notice of electronic Filing on Defendant Daniel Cregan; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 06/23/2019; Received: 06/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Mcguire, R.; Filed: 04/15/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less