This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 03/17/2023 at 11:06:42 (UTC).

Tara Fitzgerald v. Monroe Beach Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 Tara Fitzgerald filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Monroe Beach Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Mccormack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Mccormack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tara Fitzgerald

Defendants

Monroe Beach Inc.

Monroe Beach Owners Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELEFTERAKIS, NICHOLAS

AMATO, RYAN JOHN

MAGILL, MELISSA NICOLE

DEMIDOV, ANDREY

Defendant Attorney

DEBELLIS, CLAUDIO

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Exhibit K

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Exhibit K; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Exhibit J

EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Exhibit J; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I

EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Exhibit H

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Exhibit H; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

ANSWER Answer & Combined Demands

ANSWER Answer & Combined Demands; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 08/16/2021

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 02/23/2023; Received: 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Supplemental Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #003) Exhibit K; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) Exhibit J; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I; Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Demidov, A.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #003) Exhibit I; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Exhibit H; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Exhibit G Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 01/23/2023; Received: 01/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by Lexitas Legal; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by Lexitas Legal; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by Lexitas Legal; Filed: 09/27/2021; Received: 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Combined Demands; Filed By: Debellis, C.; Filed: 09/24/2021; Received: 09/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/14/2021; Received: 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 09/09/2021; Received: 09/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 08/16/2021; Received: 08/16/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less