Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 03:43:04 (UTC).

Tallen Todorovich v. 63 Wall Street Owner, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/24/2019 Tallen Todorovich filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 63 Wall Street Owner, L L C. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathryn E. Freed. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Kathryn E. Freed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tallen Todorovich

Defendants

67 Wall Street Owner, L.L.C.

63 Wall Street Owner, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACHAR, ROGER ALAN

Attorney at NEWMAN FERRARA LLP

Defendant Attorney

WELLING, THOMAS JOHN

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Apartment Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Apartment Lease; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Apartment Lease

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Apartment Lease; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Thomas J. Welling, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Thomas J. Welling, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Commercial Division Assignment

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Commercial Division Assignment; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint extended to February ... show more

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint extended to February ... show more; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to February 14, 2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to February 14, 2020; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to January 17, 2020

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to January 17, 2020; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS

SUPPORTING PLEADINGS; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Apartment Lease; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Apartment Lease; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Thomas J. Welling, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/28/2020; Received: 02/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Commercial Division Assignment; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint extended to February 28, 2020; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to February 14, 2020; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Complaint to January 17, 2020; Filed By: Welling, T.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 12/11/2019; Received: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PLEADINGS; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 11/25/2019; Received: 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sachar, R.; Filed: 11/24/2019; Received: 11/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less