This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:43 (UTC).

TAJA BROCKMAN - v. - NEW YORK METHODIST HOSPITAL et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 TAJA BROCKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NEW YORK METHODIST HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taja Brockman

Defendants

Elizabeth Marie O'shea-speed MD

Cicely Chen MD

Maya Sanchez-ritunno MD

NEW YORK METHODIST HOSPITAL

Michael L Lewis MD

MOUNT SINAI BETH ISRAEL f/k/a BETH ISRAEL MEDICAL CENTER

Evgenia Polosina MD

Mahtab A Mufti MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ, IVAN J

Defendant Attorneys

KARP, PAUL J.

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

LEVINE, JENNIFER ANN

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker

GOLDSTEIN, LISA BETH

Attorney at MCALOON & FRIEDMAN, PC

WANG, KEVIN SHI YI

Attorney at McAloon & Friedman, P.C.

SULLIVAN, MARK PATRICK

Attorney at MCALOON & FRIEDMAN, P.C.

KELTON, DAVID G.

Attorney at MCALOON & FRIEDMAN, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #5) Response to PCO & CCO

EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #5) Response to PCO & CCO; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #5) Response to Demand for AZ

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #5) Response to Demand for AZ; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #5) Response to Demand

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #5) Response to Demand; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #5) Bills of Particulars (Supp)

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #5) Bills of Particulars (Supp); Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #5) Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #5) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Good Faith Letters

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Good Faith Letters; Filed By: Wang, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Aff of Service Dr Chen

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Aff of Service Dr Chen; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr Mufti

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr Mufti; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Mt Sinai Beth Israel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Mt Sinai Beth Israel; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt Sinai Beth Israel

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt Sinai Beth Israel; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr O'Shea-Speed

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr O'Shea-Speed; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Lewis

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Lewis; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Chen

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Chen; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Methodist Hospital

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Methodist Hospital; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #5) Compliance with Order; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #5) Response to PCO & CCO; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #5) Response to Demand for AZ; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #5) Response to Demand; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #5) Bills of Particulars (Supp); Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #5) Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #5) Affirmation in Opposition; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #5) Good Faith Letters; Filed By: Wang, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #5) Court Order; Filed By: Wang, K.; Filed: 01/28/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Aff of Service Dr Lewis; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Aff of Service Dr Chen; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr Mufti; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Mt Sinai Beth Israel; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service - Mt Sinai Beth Israel; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service Dr O'Shea-Speed; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Lewis; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Dr Chen; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Methodist Hospital; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 10/02/2017; Received: 10/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rodriguez, I.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less