This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 09:14:38 (UTC).

T H v. TOMPKINS COUNTY et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 T H filed an Other lawsuit against TOMPKINS COUNTY. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick F Macrae. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0244

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Patrick F Macrae

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

T H

Defendants

Patrick R Hughes

TOMPKINS COUNTY

TOMPKINS COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONINA, JOHN

Attorney at BONINA AND BONINA, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, JONATHAN

Attorney at TOMPKINS COUNTY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym

EXHIBIT(S) - D Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym

EXHIBIT(S) - C Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym

EXHIBIT(S) - B Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym

EXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2)

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) OSC for leave to file a civil action under the CVA using Pseudonym & Attorney's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) OSC for leave to file a civil action under the CVA using Pseudonym & Attorney's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Order Granting Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Under a Pesudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Decision and Order to Proceed Under Pseudonym; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 07/10/2020; Received: 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2); Filed By: Wood, J.; Filed: 06/30/2020; Received: 06/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/15/2020; Received: 06/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) OSC for leave to file a civil action under the CVA using Pseudonym & Attorney's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Bonina, J.; Filed: 06/11/2020; Received: 06/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less