This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 21:15:46 (UTC).

Syracuse Regional Airport Authority v. R.A.C. Holding, Inc. d/b/a Americar, d/b/a Dollar, and d/b/a Thrifty

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Syracuse Regional Airport Authority filed an Other lawsuit against R A C Holding, Inc d/b/a Americar, d/b/a Dollar, and d/b/a Thrifty. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah H Karalunas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Deborah H Karalunas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Syracuse Regional Airport Authority

Defendant

R.A.C. Holding, Inc. d/b/a Americar, d/b/a Dollar, and d/b/a Thrifty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARRERO, MICHAEL GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

KIRWAN, TERRY J.

Attorney at kirwan law

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Kirwan, T.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Fogarty Affidavit Ex. A (Americar Agreement)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Fogarty Affidavit Ex. A (Americar Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Fogarty Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Fogarty Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Marrero Affirmation Ex. C (Thrifty Demand Letter)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Marrero Affirmation Ex. C (Thrifty Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Marrero Affirmation Ex. B (Dollar Demand Letter)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Marrero Affirmation Ex. B (Dollar Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT The motion return date is April 10, 2019.

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT The motion return date is April 10, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Fogarty Affidavit Ex. C (Thrifty Agreement)

EXHIBIT(S) - C Fogarty Affidavit Ex. C (Thrifty Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Fogarty Affidavit Ex. B (Dollar Agreement)

EXHIBIT(S) - B Fogarty Affidavit Ex. B (Dollar Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Marrero Affirmation Ex. A (Americar Demand Letter)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Marrero Affirmation Ex. A (Americar Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Marrero Affirmation in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Marrero Affirmation in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Kirwan, T.; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 02/12/2019; Received: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT The motion return date is April 10, 2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Fogarty Affidavit Ex. C (Thrifty Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Fogarty Affidavit Ex. B (Dollar Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Fogarty Affidavit Ex. A (Americar Agreement); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Fogarty Affidavit in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Marrero Affirmation Ex. C (Thrifty Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Marrero Affirmation Ex. B (Dollar Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Marrero Affirmation Ex. A (Americar Demand Letter); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Marrero Affirmation in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Marrero, M.; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less