This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:11:13 (UTC).

SUSAN LECOQ v. IGLESIA EVANGELICA CO-OP CITY UNITED METHODIST

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 SUSAN LECOQ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IGLESIA EVANGELICA CO-OP CITY UNITED METHODIST. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald Miles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald Miles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Lecoq

Defendant

IGLESIA EVANGELICA CO-OP CITY UNITED METHODIST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAY, JOHN E

Attorney at The Law Offices of John E. Gray

Defendant Attorney

GALVANO, JOSEPH

Attorney at Galvano & Xanthakis, PC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 1/27/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 1/27/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 12/11/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 12/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED OCTOBER 23, 2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED OCTOBER 23, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 08/29/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 08/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 4/17/19

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 4/17/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) *Corrected*

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

ANSWER Answer

ANSWER Answer; Filed By: Galvano, J.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 1/27/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 12/11/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED OCTOBER 23, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 08/29/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/04/2019; Received: 09/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 05/14/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 4/17/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/25/2019; Received: 04/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) *Corrected*; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 04/17/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer; Filed By: Galvano, J.; Filed: 03/18/2019; Received: 03/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 02/22/2019; Received: 02/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gray, J.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less