Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 18:42:13 (UTC).

SUFFOLK FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. ALI HASSAN NAWAZ

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 SUFFOLK FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALI HASSAN NAWAZ. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUFFOLK FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Ali Hassan Nawaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, KEITH H

Attorney at RUBIN & ROTHMAN, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702

AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1296702

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1296702

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING

COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1296702

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - 202.27 PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/17/2019; Received: 10/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rothman, K. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 10/14/2019; Received: 10/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT 1296702; Filed By: Rothman, K.; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less