This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 10/20/2022 at 18:24:39 (UTC).

STEVEN XAVIER PENA et al - v. - CITY OF BUFFALO et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 STEVEN XAVIER PENA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BUFFALO. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Albany, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank A Sedita. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2016

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Frank A Sedita

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Katrina Krisnosky

Steven xavier Pena an infant, by and through his Parent and Natural Guardian, KATRINA KRISNOSKY

Defendants

CITY OF BUFFALO

BUFFALO BOARD OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NICASTRO, JOSEPH LUCIAN

Defendant Attorney

POOLE, CHRISTOPHER RYAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT

ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Retainer

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Retainer; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Correspondence with Payment to Dr. Tetro Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Correspondence with Payment to Dr. Tetro Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Dr. Tetro Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Dr. Tetro Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Attorney Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S)

Structured Settlement Proposal

NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

ORDER - OTHER

Scheduling Order

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

City of Buffalo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Buffalo Board of Education

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Retainer; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Correspondence with Payment to Dr. Tetro Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Dr. Tetro Invoice Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Supplemental Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #006); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Attorney Affirmation; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Structured Settlement Proposal Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Pinnacle Records Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/16/2019; Received: 08/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/22/2017; Received: 08/22/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Scheduling Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 03/20/2017; Received: 03/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 12/15/2016; Received: 12/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Poole, C.; Filed: 10/07/2016; Received: 10/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Poole, C.; Filed: 10/07/2016; Received: 10/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE City of Buffalo; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 10/05/2016; Received: 10/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Buffalo Board of Education; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 10/05/2016; Received: 10/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Nicastro, J.; Filed: 08/25/2016; Received: 08/25/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less