Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:26:19 (UTC).

STEVEN MARTIN v. GEORGE I. WEINSTEIN O.D. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 STEVEN MARTIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against GEORGE I WEINSTEIN O D. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Martin

Defendants

George I. Weinstein O.D.

CHEAPER PEEPERS OF NEW HYDE PARK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPISI, JOSEPH

Attorney at SCHWARTZ GOLDSTONE & CAMPISI, LLP

Defendant Attorney

SCHRIER, RICHARD E

Attorney at Schrier Shayne Koenig Samberg & Ryne P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

COURT NOTICE

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

--none--

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

--none--

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DAMAGES PER CPLR 3017(c)

DEMAND FOR:

NOTICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2103(5)-NO SERVICE BY FAX

DEMAND FOR:

MEDICARE DEMAND PURSUANT TO SCHIP ACT

DEMAND FOR:

COMBINED DISCOVERY DEMANDS

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSTION

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

ANSWER

VERIFIED ANSWER

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Campisi, J.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2019; Received: 10/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Campisi, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Campisi, J.; Filed: 10/24/2019; Received: 10/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF DAMAGES PER CPLR 3017(c); Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: NOTICE PURSUANT TO CPLR 2103(5)-NO SERVICE BY FAX; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: MEDICARE DEMAND PURSUANT TO SCHIP ACT; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: COMBINED DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSTION; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Schrier, R.; Filed: 08/26/2019; Received: 08/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Campisi, J.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less