This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 06:56:59 (UTC).

Steven Gurewitsch et al v. Joseph Korff et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Steven Gurewitsch filed an Other lawsuit against Joseph Korff. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anne Schwartz

Steven Gurewitsch

Defendants

UCL LP

3618 LLC

UCL LLC

Arc Development LLC

Riverdale Heights LLC

John Does 1-10

Riverdale Heights I LLC

Arc Marketing LLC

ABC Companies 1-10

Joseph Korff

Arc Real Estate Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRIPODI, JOSEPH

Attorney at KRANJAC TRIPODI & PARTNERS LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation (Entity Def Letter)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation (Entity Def Letter); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Letter to Entity Defendants (3-4-20)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Letter to Entity Defendants (3-4-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation - Korff Letter

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation - Korff Letter; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Letter to Korff (3-4-20)

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Letter to Korff (3-4-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)

ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint (filed 218-20)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Verified Complaint (filed 218-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

AFFIRMATION of Counsel In Support Of Order to Show Cause

AFFIRMATION of Counsel In Support Of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Email from Joshua Korff (9-23-19)

EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Email from Joshua Korff (9-23-19); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 IRS Notice (7-30-18)

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 IRS Notice (7-30-18); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Balance Sheet of Solaria (12-31-17)

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Balance Sheet of Solaria (12-31-17); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 3618 LLC Operating Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 3618 LLC Operating Agreement; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation (Entity Def Letter); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Letter to Entity Defendants (3-4-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Fed Ex Confirmation - Korff Letter; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Letter to Korff (3-4-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 03/06/2020; Received: 03/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2020; Received: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-4 (Motion #001) Email J. Korff to S. Gurewitsch (9-23-19); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A-1 (Motion #001) 3618 Operating Agreement; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Verified Complaint (filed 218-20); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) of Counsel In Support Of Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/23/2020; Received: 02/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 4 Email from Joshua Korff (9-23-19); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 IRS Notice (7-30-18); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 Balance Sheet of Solaria (12-31-17); Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 3618 LLC Operating Agreement; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tripodi, J.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less