This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:04:09 (UTC).

Steve Reynolds et al - v. - Afropunk, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Steve Reynolds filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Afropunk, LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richard Lipp

Steve Reynolds

Defendant

Afropunk, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCUTERI, SERGIO I.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice

NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

AFFIDAVIT Of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons Pursuant to CPLR Sec. 325(g)(4)(i)

AFFIDAVIT Of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons Pursuant to CPLR Sec. 325(g)(4)(i); Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to Defendant Afropunk LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to Defendant Afropunk LLC; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Promissory Note #8

EXHIBIT(S) - C Promissory Note #8; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B Promissory Note # 7

EXHIBIT(S) - B Promissory Note # 7; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Purchase Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Note Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons Pursuant to CPLR Sec. 325(g)(4)(i); Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to Defendant Afropunk LLC; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Promissory Note #8; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Promissory Note # 7; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Note Purchase Agreement; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Scuteri, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less