This case was last updated from Westchester County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 13:05:26 (UTC).

Sterling Insurance Company a/s/o The Frank Vassallo III Irrevocable Trust v. Flavio M. Cachipulla et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Sterling Insurance Company a/s/o The Frank Vassallo III Irrevocable Trust filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Flavio M Cachipulla. This case was filed in Westchester County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2022

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Westchester, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sterling Insurance Company a/s/o The Frank Vassallo III Irrevocable Trust

Defendants

Flavio M. Cachipulla

Tamy Collaguazo

Carmen Brito

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLIN, FREDRIC P

Defendant Attorneys

FENDT, ERIC GARY

RUDY, BRIAN R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 09/29/2022; Received: 09/29/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for defendant, Tamy Collaguazo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for defendant, Tamy Collaguazo; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 11/01/2022; Received: 11/01/2022

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

ANSWER Answer of Defendant Carmen Brito

ANSWER Answer of Defendant Carmen Brito; Filed By: Rudy, B.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer of Defendant Carmen Brito; Filed By: Rudy, B.; Filed: 01/26/2023; Received: 01/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Fendt, E. - filed by Law Offices of John Trop; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for defendant, Tamy Collaguazo; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 11/01/2022; Received: 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gallin, F.; Filed: 09/29/2022; Received: 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less