This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 06:07:13 (UTC).

Stephen Fazio - v. - 2 North 6th Street Property Owner LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Stephen Fazio filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 2 North 6th Street Property Owner LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Jury Coordinating Part 1. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Jury Coordinating Part 1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Fazio

Defendants and Petitioners

J.E. LEVINE BUILDER, INC D/B/A LEVINE BUILDERS

2 North 6th Street Property Owner LLC

Douglaston development LLC

Respondent

Steven Dubner Landscaping, Inc.

Defendant, Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

Douglaston development LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Plaintiff Attorney

WASSERMAN, MARC HAYWOOD

Attorney at Marc H. wasserman, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

SCOTT HAWORTH (571-1789) BENJAMIN FEIDEN SILFEN SCOTT LAWRENCE HAWORTH

Defendant Attorneys

SILFEN, BENJAMIN FEIDEN

Attorney at Haworth Barber & Gerstman, LLC

HAWORTH, SCOTT LAWRENCE

Attorney at HAWORTH BARBER & GERSTMAN, LLC

HAWORTH, SCOTT

Attorney at Haworth Barber & Gertsman

Respondent Attorney

TIMOTHY DEY CAMERON (0114.1593.0000) AMANDA DICKENS (0114.1593)

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Supreme Court, Kings County / Appellate Division, Second Department re: Withdrawal of Appe ... show more

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Supreme Court, Kings County / Appellate Division, Second Department re: Withdrawal of Appe ... show more; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #10) Stipulation Withdrawing Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #10) Stipulation Withdrawing Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal with Informational Statement, Copy of Order as Exhibit A and Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal with Informational Statement, Copy of Order as Exhibit A and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #12) dtd 8/5/19 nsp.

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #12) dtd 8/5/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - 8-5-19 Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - 8-5-19 Order; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order with Notice of Entry and Affidavit of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order with Notice of Entry and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #12) Affidavit of Service re Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion and in Further Support ... show more

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #12) Affidavit of Service re Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion and in Further Support ... show more; Filed By: Haworth, S.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #12) Exhibit G - P's Motion to Strike

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #12) Exhibit G - P's Motion to Strike; Filed By: Haworth, S.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AMENDED

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AMENDED; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

COMPLAINT (AMENDED)

COMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Maletta, L.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

285 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/25/2019; Received: 09/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Supreme Court, Kings County / Appellate Division, Second Department re: Withdrawal of Appeal; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #10) Stipulation Withdrawing Defendants/Third Party Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 09/13/2019; Received: 09/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal with Informational Statement, Copy of Order as Exhibit A and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - 8-5-19 Order; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order with Notice of Entry and Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Silfen, B.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #12) dtd 8/5/19 nsp.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #12) Affidavit of Service re Affirmation in Opposition to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion and in Further Support of Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Order to Show Cause; Filed By: Haworth, S.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #12) Exhibit G - P's Motion to Strike; Filed By: Haworth, S.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #12) Exhibit F - P's dep and continued dep - Mini; Filed By: Haworth, S.; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
278 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/23/2017; Received: 08/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT AMENDED; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/21/2017; Received: 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED); Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 08/05/2017; Received: 08/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER; Filed By: Maletta, L.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Wasserman, M. - filed by Direct Process Server LLC; Filed: 06/15/2017; Received: 06/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserman, M.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less