This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 12:40:52 (UTC).

Stephen A Shugarts v. Christopher W Erb

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 Stephen A Shugarts filed an Other lawsuit against Christopher W Erb. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Grisanti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mark Grisanti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen A Shugarts

Defendant

Christopher W Erb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUFFRANIERI, MARTIN JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARTIN ZUFFRANIERI

Defendant Attorney

GRAFF, KEVIN JAY

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) correspondence requesting address of witness

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) correspondence requesting address of witness; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) correspondence disclosing witness

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) correspondence disclosing witness; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) pleadings; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) email correspondence

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) email correspondence; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) good faith letter

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) good faith letter; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) discovery demands

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) discovery demands; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zuffranieri, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zuffranieri, M.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISCONTINUANCE; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 12/31/2019; Received: 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) correspondence requesting address of witness; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) correspondence disclosing witness; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) pleadings; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) email correspondence; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) good faith letter; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) discovery demands; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 05/30/2019; Received: 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SCHEDULING ORDER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Graff, K.; Filed: 03/11/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Zuffranieri, M.; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Zuffranieri, M.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less