This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 16:27:14 (UTC).

Stephanie Theophile - v. - Adele Hamway et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2017 Stephanie Theophile filed an Other lawsuit against Adele Hamway. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephanie Theophile

Defendants and Petitioners

Adele Hamway

Toyota Lease Trust

Respondents

JAdeleelien Hamway

LM Bus Corp.

Jelien P Cassimy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUTH, MARSHALL SCOTT

Attorney at MARSHALL S. BLUTH, ESQ.

Petitioner Attorney

MARK A LONGO

Defendant Attorneys

DRYNDA, ANNA

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

LONGO, MARK A

Attorney at MARK A LONGO

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT WINSOR GIFFORD (590-485)

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 12/12/18

ORDER - OTHER dated 12/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order to File NOI

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order to File NOI; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) DATED 11/19/18

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) DATED 11/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) CC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) CC Order; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) PC Order

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) PC Order; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

ANSWER Answer w/ discovery demands

ANSWER Answer w/ discovery demands; Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT

THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Longo, M.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Longo, M.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI); Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 04/12/2019; Received: 04/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 12/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order to File NOI; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 12/13/2018; Received: 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) DATED 11/19/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2); Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) CC Order; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #2) PC Order; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) *Corrected* Motion to Strike Def Answer; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 11/01/2018; Received: 11/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1); Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 10/04/2017; Received: 10/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 09/15/2017; Received: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer w/ discovery demands; Filed By: Drynda, A.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Filed By: Longo, M.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Longo, M.; Filed: 08/04/2017; Received: 08/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bluth, M.; Filed: 07/18/2017; Received: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less