Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Albany County Courts on 03/19/2021 at 06:53:00 (UTC).

Stearns Bank National Association v. Farah Sajid et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Stearns Bank National Association filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Farah Sajid. This case was filed in Albany County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise A. Hartman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6-21

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Albany County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Albany, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Denise A. Hartman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stearns Bank National Association

Defendants

Sajid Hussain

Farah Sajid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PINCUS, ANDREW JAN

Attorney at SEIDMAN & PINCUS, LLC

ARNOTT, MARIA ANNA

Attorney at Seidman & Pincus LLC

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnott, M.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/25/2021; Received: 02/25/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Semblance Ch 11 Plan

EXHIBIT(S) - C Semblance Ch 11 Plan; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B August 20, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - B August 20, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A May 13, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty

EXHIBIT(S) - A May 13, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons and Notice of Motion

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons and Notice of Motion; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Arnott, M.; Filed: 02/26/2021; Received: 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/25/2021; Received: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Semblance Ch 11 Plan; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B August 20, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A May 13, 2019 Finance Agr./Guaranty; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI Summons and Notice of Motion; Filed By: Pincus, A.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less