This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 13:52:51 (UTC).

Statement Services Corp. v. Lerock Construction LP et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Statement Services Corp filed an Other lawsuit against Lerock Construction LP. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Roy Mahon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Roy Mahon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Statement Services Corp.

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

James Rockefeller

Dennis Rockefeller

ABL Venture Capital Group LLC

Lerock Construction LP

Barry Leon PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKOWITZ, JAY S

Attorney at THE LAW OFICES OF JAY S. MARKOWITZ, P. C.

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

STANZIALE, THOMAS JON

Attorney at THOMAS STANZIALE ESQ.

Rockefeller, Dennis

Rockefeller, James

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Loan agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Loan agreement; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Corporate filing

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Corporate filing; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavits in Opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavits in Opposition; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in opposition

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in opposition; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Markowitz, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Markowitz, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/30/2019; Received: 09/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Complaint; Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 06/03/2019; Received: 06/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001); Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Loan agreement; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Corporate filing; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavits in Opposition; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in opposition; Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 05/07/2019; Received: 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Stanziale, T.; Filed: 04/22/2019; Received: 04/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Rockefeller, D. (Pro Hac / Pro Se); Filed: 02/20/2019; Received: 02/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/19/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Markowitz, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Markowitz, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Markowitz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less