This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 14:36:09 (UTC).

STATE OF NEW YORK - v. - RICHARD FUENTES

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 STATE OF NEW YORK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARD FUENTES. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF NEW YORK

Defendant

Richard Fuentes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAGO, ANNE MARIE

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF NEW YORK

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 04/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 03/29/2018; Received: 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 08/31/2017; Received: 08/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE; Filed By: Rago, A. - filed by STATE OF NEW YORK; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less