This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 19:55:36 (UTC).

STATE OF NEW YORK - v. - MICHAEL DAVID BROWN et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 STATE OF NEW YORK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL DAVID BROWN. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2564

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF NEW YORK

Defendants

Lauren E Brown A/K/A LAUREN E FERRITER

Michael David Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSON, NANCY JEAN

Attorney at New York State Attorney General

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (MDB)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (MDB); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (LEB)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (LEB); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY 18 02 15 NOE

NOTICE OF ENTRY 18 02 15 NOE; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 01/03/2018

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 17 12 19 AOR

AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 17 12 19 AOR; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

AFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (MICHAEL)

AFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

AFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (LAUREN)

AFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (LAUREN); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 17 12 19 JMT

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 17 12 19 JMT; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING

AFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING (MICHAEL)

AFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS (MICHAEL)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)

NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice Dated 06/12/2017

SUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice Dated 06/12/2017; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (MDB); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 18 02 27 AOS (LEB); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 03/02/2018; Received: 03/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY 18 02 15 NOE; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 02/27/2018; Received: 02/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/29/2017; Received: 01/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY 17 12 19 AOR; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION 17 12 19 AONMS (LAUREN); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) 17 12 19 JMT; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 12/20/2017; Received: 12/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT 17 07 31 AFF OF ADDITIONAL MAILING (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 17 07 19 AOS (MICHAEL); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 07/31/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION); Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS WITH NOTICE Summons with Notice Dated 06/12/2017; Filed By: Larson, N.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less