This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 05/03/2020 at 14:00:21 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company-ASO et al - v. - Falcon Express Cargo LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company-ASO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Falcon Express Cargo LLC. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nathaniel B Perez

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company-ASO

Defendants

Falcon Express Cargo LLC

Sonore Daudin

DAS Transportation LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, DENNIS D

Attorney at The Stuttman Law Group, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice to Withdraw Motion

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice to Withdraw Motion; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Affidavit

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Affidavit; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint and Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint and Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Salvage invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Salvage invoice; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Claim payment/Invoices

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Claim payment/Invoices; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Vehicle Valuation Summary

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Vehicle Valuation Summary; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Photograph of Defendant's vehicle

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Photograph of Defendant's vehicle; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Report; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice to Withdraw Motion; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/27/2019; Received: 08/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Non Military Affidavit; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) CPLR 3215 Affidavit; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint and Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Salvage invoice; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Claim payment/Invoices; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Vehicle Valuation Summary; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Photograph of Defendant's vehicle; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Report; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 09/04/2018; Received: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Murphy, D. - filed by Wittenberg, J.; Filed: 08/17/2018; Received: 08/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Murphy, D.; Filed: 06/28/2018; Received: 06/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less