This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 00:00:53 (UTC).

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company - v. - Asael Hernandez et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Asael Hernandez. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Defendants

Huntington Regional Chiropractic, P.C.

DA Acupuncture, P.C.

Hector Melgar, P.T.

Orthomotion Rehab DME, LLC

Orthocare Surgical

Jose Castillo

Garden State Orthocare L.L.C. d/b/a Orthocare Surigical

Southside Hospital

Northwell Health, Inc.

Asael Hernandez

Hector Melgar, PT, P.C.

Radiology Associates Open MRI

Long Island Jewish Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AITKEN, RICHARD CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

JUDGMENT dated 4/9/19

JUDGMENT dated 4/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 4/9/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 4/9/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS - default judgment

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS - default judgment; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Castillo

EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Castillo; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Hernandez

EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Hernandez; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUNTINGTON REGIONAL CHIRO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUNTINGTON REGIONAL CHIRO; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HECTOR MELGAR PT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HECTOR MELGAR PT; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DA ACUPUNCTURE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DA ACUPUNCTURE; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HECTOR MELGAR PT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HECTOR MELGAR PT; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARDEN STATE ORTHO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARDEN STATE ORTHO; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Policy

EXHIBIT(S) - B Policy; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT dated 4/9/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED dated 4/9/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/11/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS - default judgment; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Castillo; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #1) EUO Transcript - Hernandez; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #1) certified police report; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOSE CASTILLO; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HUNTINGTON REGIONAL CHIRO; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS HECTOR MELGAR PT; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DA ACUPUNCTURE; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE HECTOR MELGAR PT; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARDEN STATE ORTHO; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 07/20/2018; Received: 07/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Policy; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Aitken, R.; Filed: 06/07/2018; Received: 06/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less