Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 01:36:44 (UTC).

STANLEY TROJANIAK - v. - ALEXANDER OLDJA et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2017 STANLEY TROJANIAK filed an Other lawsuit against ALEXANDER OLDJA. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Maria S Vazquezdoles. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Maria S Vazquezdoles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Trojaniak as Administrator of the Estate of Tomasz Ziolkowski

Defendants

Alexander Oldja

Allen Oldja

Not Yet Classified

Alexander Oldja Allen Oldja

Alexander Oldja and Allen Oldja, Defendants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABAJ, Paul T

Attorney at SABAJ LAW, P.C.

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ZIOBRO, JOHN ERIC

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF JOHN E. ZIOBRO

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISMISSAL

ORDER - DISMISSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Reply and Opposition to Sabaj Cross-Motion, Memo of Law and Affirmation in Support

AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Reply and Opposition to Sabaj Cross-Motion, Memo of Law and Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Paul T. Sabaj, Esq. in Further Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Paul T. Sabaj, Esq. in Further Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Response to Counterclaims (Proposed)

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Response to Counterclaims (Proposed); Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Exhibit B - Answer with Counterclaims

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Exhibit B - Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A - Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A - Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and in Opposition to Defendant' ... show more

MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and in Opposition to Defendant' ... show more; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross-Motion

NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross-Motion; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) RJI

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition and Petition to admit Mazur pro ad hoc vice

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition and Petition to admit Mazur pro ad hoc vice; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Verified Answer

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Verified Answer; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for eFiling

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for eFiling; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service of S&C and Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Submit Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service of S&C and Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Submit Answer; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Land Assesment

EXHIBIT(S) - A Land Assesment; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

SUMMONS Summons Trojaniak vs Oldja et ano

SUMMONS Summons Trojaniak vs Oldja et ano; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Reply and Opposition to Sabaj Cross-Motion, Memo of Law and Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 12/11/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation of Paul T. Sabaj, Esq. in Further Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Response to Counterclaims (Proposed); Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Exhibit B - Answer with Counterclaims; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Exhibit A - Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and in Opposition to Defendant's Motion; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Cross-Motion; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 11/28/2017; Received: 11/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion for Default Judgment; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Request for Working copies; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) RJI; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #1) Notice of Petition and Petition to admit Mazur pro ad hoc vice; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service of Verified Answer; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Ziobro, J.; Filed: 06/12/2017; Received: 06/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for eFiling; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Acknowledgment of Service of S&C and Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Submit Answer; Filed By: Sabaj, P. - filed by SABAJ LAW, P.C.; Filed: 05/15/2017; Received: 05/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Land Assesment; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons Trojaniak vs Oldja et ano; Filed By: Sabaj, P.; Filed: 04/28/2017; Received: 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less