This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 19:01:33 (UTC).

Stanley John and Beena John as parents and natural guardians of A.J., an infant and A.D.J., an infant - v. - Darryl C De Vivo MD et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 Stanley John and Beena John as parents and natural guardians of A J , an infant and A D J , an infant filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Darryl C De Vivo MD. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley John and Beena John as parents and natural guardians of A.J., an infant and A.D.J., an infant

Defendants

New York-Presbyterian Morgan Stanley Children's Hospital

New York-Presbyterian/Columbia University Medical Center

Moris Angulo MD

Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York

Wendy Chung MD

Winthrop Pediatric Associates, PC

The Neurological Institute

The New York and Presbyterian Hospital

Darryl C De vivo MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ, MERYL I

Attorney at JONATHAN C. REITER

Defendant Attorneys

MCCALLEN, GRACE CARRERAS

Attorney at BARTLETT MCDONOUGH & MONAGHAN, LLP

MCENROE, MICHELE LYNN

Attorney at Vigorito, Barker, Patterson, Nichols & Porter, LLP

PEWARSKI, GLEN THOMAS

Attorney at BARTLETT LLP

FABIANO, ANGELA

Attorney at ANGEL & McCARTHY, PLLC

MCCARTHY, JAMES DENIS

Attorney at ANGEL & McCARTHY, PLLC

IERACI, VINCENZO

Attorney at Benvenuto & Slattery

FREILICH, FARIJE

Attorney at KERLEY, WALSH, MATERA & CINQUEMANI

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Trustees of Columbia University

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Trustees of Columbia University; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - New York and Presbyterian Hospital

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - New York and Presbyterian Hospital; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands & Demand for VBP

ANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands & Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - de vivo

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - de vivo; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Neurological Institute

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Neurological Institute; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Chung

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Chung; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Address; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/02/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001); Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 12/10/2018; Received: 12/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2018; Received: 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2018; Received: 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Mcenroe, M.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Morgan Stanley Children Hospital; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 08/15/2017; Received: 08/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Trustees of Columbia University; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - New York and Presbyterian Hospital; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands and Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer, Combined Demands & Demand for VBP; Filed By: Pewarski, G.; Filed: 07/27/2017; Received: 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service - de vivo; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Neurological Institute; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Chung; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Schwartz, M.; Filed: 07/06/2017; Received: 07/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less