This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 15:05:16 (UTC).

STACIE L GARDNER et al v. BUDGET CAR RENTAL et al

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 STACIE L GARDNER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BUDGET CAR RENTAL. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shauna P Logan

Tyannia Gardner

Stacie L Gardner

Tynassia Tracie Gardner

Defendants

BUDGET CAR RENTAL

John Doe

Taleeb Maxime

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDER, MARK

Attorney at HARMON, LINDER & ROGOWSKY, ESQS.

Defendant Attorneys

SCLAFANI, MICHAEL V

Attorney at REARDON & SCLAFANI P C

PILLISCHER, JONATHAN

Attorney at Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling

 

Court Documents

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/24/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/24/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

DEMAND FOR: Discovery and Notices

DEMAND FOR: Discovery and Notices; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) BTR

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) BTR; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 1/24/2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 01/21/2020; Received: 01/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Pillischer, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/09/2019; Received: 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Discovery and Notices; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) BTR; Filed By: Sclafani, M.; Filed: 06/13/2019; Received: 06/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/12/2019; Received: 06/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/04/2019; Received: 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Linder, M. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less