This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 16:13:43 (UTC).

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union - v. - Wilmer Soto aka Irizarry et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2017 Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wilmer Soto aka Irizarry. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1059

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Dianalee Santiago aka mendez aka velez

Wilmer Soto aka irizarry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - B Military Verification; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Order

EXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Order; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOM DS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOM DS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service-DS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service-DS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/15/2019; Received: 08/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Military Verification; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Order; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/02/2019; Received: 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOM DS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOM WS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 03/08/2018; Received: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service-DS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki; Filed: 02/22/2018; Received: 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2018; Received: 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/12/2017; Received: 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less