This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:32:25 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CHAUTAUQUA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. NICOLE NICKERSON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 SOUTHERN CHAUTAUQUA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICOLE NICKERSON. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0054

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CHAUTAUQUA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Nicole Nickerson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Attorney Fee Provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 09/24/2019; Received: 09/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 03/21/2019; Received: 03/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less