This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 23:15:23 (UTC).

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union v. NELSON RUIZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NELSON RUIZ. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1242

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Nelson Ruiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Attorney Fee Provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Attorney Fee Provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney's Affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/04/2020; Received: 01/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/04/2020; Received: 01/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Attorney Fee Provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/31/2020; Received: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/04/2020; Received: 01/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 01/04/2020; Received: 01/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/23/2019; Received: 09/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less