This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 15:14:44 (UTC).

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union v. MICHAEL BORST

Case Summary

On 05/15/2019 Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL BORST. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0784

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Michael Borst

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1)

ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) default judgment/attorney fees

RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) default judgment/attorney fees; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - f (Motion #1) aof

EXHIBIT(S) - f (Motion #1) aof; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #1) aom-3215

EXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #1) aom-3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #1) military verification

EXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #1) military verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 12/30/2019; Received: 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/26/2019; Received: 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) default judgment/attorney fees; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - f (Motion #1) aof; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - e (Motion #1) aom-3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - d (Motion #1) military verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - c (Motion #1) aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) s&c Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/19/2019; Received: 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 05/15/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less