This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 22:34:31 (UTC).

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union v. BRIAN M BUSH

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN M BUSH. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1243

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Southern Chautauqua Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Brian M Bush

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of facts

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 308

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 308; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 03/10/2020; Received: 03/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 308; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less