This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:26:57 (UTC).

SONJA M MANTO et al v. SKYLAR ROSE MANTO

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 SONJA M MANTO filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against SKYLAR ROSE MANTO. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sonja M Manto

Skylar Rose Lafurge

Defendant

Skylar Rose Manto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO, DARREN MEL

Attorney at LAW AND MEDIATION OFFICE OF DARREN M. SHAPIRO, PC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION Affirmation and Authorization

AFFIRMATION Affirmation and Authorization; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 09/16/2021; Received: 09/16/2021

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Minor's Name Change

RJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Minor's Name Change; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

ORDER ( PROPOSED ); Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D Parental Consent to Minor's Change of Name

EXHIBIT(S) - D Parental Consent to Minor's Change of Name; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C Child's Consent to Minor's Change of Name

EXHIBIT(S) - C Child's Consent to Minor's Change of Name; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mother's Drivers' License

EXHIBIT(S) - B Mother's Drivers' License; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Birth

EXHIBIT(S) - A Certificate of Birth; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation and Authorization; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 09/16/2021; Received: 09/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketORDER - NAME CHANGE COMPLIED Sensitive; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Sensitive; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 09/15/2021; Received: 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Sensitive; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/30/2021; Received: 08/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: 202.6(b) Other, Minor's Name Change; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Sensitive; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Parental Consent to Minor's Change of Name; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Child's Consent to Minor's Change of Name; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Sensitive; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Sensitive; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION Sensitive; Filed By: Shapiro, D.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less