This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:14:51 (UTC).

Sonia Sinclair Johnson v. Roberto Mota et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Sonia Sinclair Johnson filed an Other lawsuit against Roberto Mota. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonia Sinclair johnson

Defendants

Shabea Sunjah shaw

Roberto Mota

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINLEY, GLENN

Attorney at GLENN FINLEY & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

PENINO, STEPHEN J

Attorney at PENINO & MOYNIHAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shaw

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shaw; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Moto

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Moto; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge regarding case settlement

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge regarding case settlement; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge regarding case settlement; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 10/08/2019; Received: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 06/25/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Penino, S.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Shaw; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Moto; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Finley, G.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less