This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:05:36 (UTC).

SONIA OJEDA-SOLORZANO - v. - ALAN ELIE et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 SONIA OJEDA-SOLORZANO filed an Other lawsuit against ALAN ELIE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonia Ojeda-solorzano

Defendants

Alan Elie

Lauren Elie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SZECHTER, MICHAEL M.

Attorney at Sackstein Sackstein & Lee, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

PLOTKIN, RUSSELL MARK

Attorney at Frankini & Harms

GRAMMATICO, CLAUDE N.

Attorney at GIALLEONARDO, FRANKINI & HARMS

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Plotkin, R.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Additional Service by Mail

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit of Lauren Elie

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Affirmation in Support

NOTICE OF MOTION

Notice of Motion

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

--none--

ANSWER

and DEMANDS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Aff of SVc re Lauren Elie

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Aff of Svc re Alan Elie

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

Summons and Verified Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action; Filed By: Plotkin, R.; Filed: 10/31/2019; Received: 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/28/2018; Received: 11/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/21/2018; Received: 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2018; Received: 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Additional Service by Mail; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 05/09/2018; Received: 05/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Affidavit of Lauren Elie; Filed By: Plotkin, R.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Plotkin, R.; Filed: 05/02/2018; Received: 05/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Notice Pursant to CPLR 306-b Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 03/13/2018; Received: 03/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/28/2018; Received: 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Grammatico, C.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Grammatico, C.; Filed: 12/08/2017; Received: 12/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER and DEMANDS; Filed By: Grammatico, C.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of SVc re Lauren Elie; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Svc re Alan Elie; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Szechter, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less