This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 04:18:04 (UTC).

SoFi LENDING CORP. v. ANTHONY BARONE

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 SoFi LENDING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY BARONE. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Ralph Porzio. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Ralph Porzio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SoFi LENDING CORP.

Defendant

Anthony Barone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VERHAGEN, JASON P

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

SARKIS, ANDREANA MARIA

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates,

WALLACE, STEPHANIE MARIE

Attorney at Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 05, 2020

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 05, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFTER COMMENCEMENT OF LITIGATION

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFTER COMMENCEMENT OF LITIGATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Loan Agreement

EXHIBIT(S) - A Loan Agreement; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Anthony Barone **ADDITIONAL NOTICE MAILED ON 5/9/19**

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Anthony Barone **ADDITIONAL NOTICE MAILED ON 5/9/19**; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Notice of Court Date

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Notice of Court Date; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Balance History

EXHIBIT(S) - B Balance History; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Invoice

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Invoice; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Statement for Judgment

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military Investigation

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military Investigation; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 05, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/05/2020; Received: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Military Investigation; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Invoice; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) Statement for Judgment; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Stewart, C.; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/18/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001); Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Notice of Court Date; Filed By: Wallace, S. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 11/07/2019; Received: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Sarkis, A. - filed by Zwicker & Associates, P.C.; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFTER COMMENCEMENT OF LITIGATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Anthony Barone **ADDITIONAL NOTICE MAILED ON 5/9/19**; Filed By: Verhagen, J. - filed by PROVEST LLC; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Balance History; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Loan Agreement; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Gerace, J. - filed by Shifflet, E.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less