Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/03/2020 at 00:21:41 (UTC).

SLM PRIVATE CREDIT STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-A - v. - AMANDA J BALLAM

Case Summary

On 06/22/2018 SLM PRIVATE CREDIT STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003-A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMANDA J BALLAM. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********63CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SLM PRIVATE CREDIT STUDENT LOAN TRUST TWO THOUSAND THREE A

SLM PRIVATE CREDIT STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2003 A

Defendant

Amanda J Ballam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARBUS, MARK A

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

ALTMAN, ANNETTE T

Attorney at FORSTER & GARBUS LLP

WATTS, VALERIE ELIZABETH

Attorney at RUBIN AND ROTHMAN, LLC

Defendant Attorney

DOUGLAS, ALEXANDER JEROME

Attorney at Douglas Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Douglas, A.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT FFKB876924 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT FFKB876924 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI); Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Douglas, A.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/05/2019; Received: 06/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Altman, A.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Garbus, M. - filed by Smart Serve Process Serving; Filed: 10/04/2018; Received: 10/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/01/2018; Received: 10/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT FFKB876924 Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Watts, V.; Filed: 06/22/2018; Received: 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less