Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Erie County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 18:49:38 (UTC).

Sirena Jordan v. Liberty Medicar, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Sirena Jordan filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Liberty Medicar, Inc. This case was filed in Erie County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Montour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Erie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Erie, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mark A Montour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sirena Jordan

Defendants

Liberty Medicar, Inc.

Pamela Robinson

John Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAJAK, GREGORY VINCENT

Attorney at CELLINO & BARNES, PC

Defendant Attorneys

CONDREN, JOHN ROBERT

Attorney at Barth Sullivan Behr

DIXON, BRIAN MICHAEL

Attorney at Nash Connors

COX, JONATHAN D.

Attorney at NASH CONNORS, P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING

ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands

DEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Dixon, B.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - John Williams

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - John Williams; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Pamela Robinson

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Pamela Robinson; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Liberty Medicar

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Liberty Medicar; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE SCHEDULING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/29/2019; Received: 07/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 05/23/2019; Received: 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Miscellaneous Disclosure Demands; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Condren, J.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Dixon, B.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - John Williams; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Pamela Robinson; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Liberty Medicar; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Pajak, G.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less