This case was last updated from Essex County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 20:46:42 (UTC).

SIMPLY FUNDING, LLC v. LOBSTER REEF, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 SIMPLY FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LOBSTER REEF, LLC. This case was filed in Essex County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0276

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Essex County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Essex, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMPLY FUNDING L L C

Defendants

Robert Borden

LOBSTER REEF L L C DBA AKA

PURPLE SAIGE BISTRO AKA

LOBSTER REEF AKA

PURPLE SAIGE TEMPTATIONS AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGER, CHAIM D.

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*

CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 12/03/2019; Received: 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) *Corrected*; Filed By: Berger, C.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less