This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:10:35 (UTC).

Silvio Gamba v. James Kelly et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Silvio Gamba filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against James Kelly. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine M Didomenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Catherine M Didomenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silvio Gamba

Defendants

McBaine Estates II Home Owners Association Inc

Maryanne Kelly

James Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISMAN, MARCEL

Attorney at Marcel Weisman, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

Shah, Payal S.

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

PODELL, REED MICHAEL

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA

NICOLINI, JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR

ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shah, P.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Shah, P.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisman, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisman, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/24/2020; Received: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Shah, P.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims; Filed By: Shah, P.; Filed: 09/05/2019; Received: 09/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/14/2019; Received: 08/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 07/30/2019; Received: 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Weisman, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands; Filed By: Nicolini, J.; Filed: 06/25/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Weisman, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less