This case was last updated from Putnam County New York Courts on 07/07/2022 at 10:15:17 (UTC).

SIERRA PACIFIC MORTGAGE COMPANY,INC v. JOSEPH DUFFY et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 SIERRA PACIFIC MORTGAGE COMPANY,INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOSEPH DUFFY. This case was filed in Putnam County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Putnam, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIERRA PACIFIC MORTGAGE COMPANY,INC

Defendants

Joseph Duffy

NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU

John Doe 1-JOHN DOE 12 THE LAST TWELVE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS AND UNKNOWN TO PLAINTIFF,THE PERSONS OR PARTIES INTENDED BEING THE TENANTS, OCCUPANTS, PERSONS OR CORPS, IF ANY, HAVING OR CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN OR LIEN UPON THE PREMISES, DESCRIBED IN T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORISKIN, SARA Z.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A LOAN DOCUMENT

EXHIBIT(S) - A LOAN DOCUMENT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU-50417789

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU-50417789; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU-50439185

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU-50439185; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD-50439187

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD-50439187; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOSEPH DUFFY

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOSEPH DUFFY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING- DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING- DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-JOSEPH DUFFY-50481486

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-JOSEPH DUFFY-50481486; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/29/2022; Received: 06/29/2022

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-JOSEPH DUFFY-50481486; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/29/2022; Received: 06/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF TENANT MAILING- DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-DORANN MOORA S/H/A JOHN DOE # 1; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- JOSEPH DUFFY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Broggy, S.; Filed: 06/27/2022; Received: 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD-50439187; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU-50439185; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/21/2022; Received: 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU-50417789; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 06/17/2022; Received: 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A LOAN DOCUMENT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Boriskin, S. - filed by ProVest,LLC by Mercedes Ramirez; Filed: 06/07/2022; Received: 06/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less