Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 18:36:07 (UTC).

SHKELZEN SHASIVARI - v. - NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 SHKELZEN SHASIVARI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shkelzen Shasivari

Defendants

NEW YORK CITY HOUSING AUTHORITY

THE CITY OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ISAAC, BRIAN J.

Attorney at POLLACK POLLACK ISAAC & DECICCO

WISELL, CHARLES EDWARD

Attorney at Lipsig Shapey Manus & Moverman, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

YARON, ADRIENNE

Attorney at Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris

GROSS, OLIVIA M

Attorney at Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.

MINICUCCI, LORA

Attorney at New York City Law Department - Tort Division

Counsel, Corporation

Attorney at New York City Corporation Counsel

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #6)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #6); Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #6) Affirmation in Reply and Further Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #6) Affirmation in Reply and Further Support; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit A - Supplemental Affidavit of Cankosyan

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit A - Supplemental Affidavit of Cankosyan; Filed By: Yaron, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5) Affirmation in Reply

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Yaron, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #5) Exhibit Q - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Lulzim Cocoli 9.19.19

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #5) Exhibit Q - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Lulzim Cocoli 9.19.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #5) Exhibit P - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Herbert Pinnock 6.7.19

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #5) Exhibit P - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Herbert Pinnock 6.7.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #5) Exhibit O - Plaintiffs response to NYCHAs combined demands 3.16.18

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #5) Exhibit O - Plaintiffs response to NYCHAs combined demands 3.16.18; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #5) Exhibit N - Order re- motion to strike Note of Issue and summary judgment deadline 9.20.19

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #5) Exhibit N - Order re- motion to strike Note of Issue and summary judgment deadline 9.20.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

ANSWER Verified Answer

ANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #6); Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #6) Affirmation in Reply and Further Support; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Exhibit A - Supplemental Affidavit of Cankosyan; Filed By: Yaron, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #5) Affirmation in Reply; Filed By: Yaron, A.; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5); Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #5) Exhibit Q - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Lulzim Cocoli 9.19.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #5) Exhibit P - Transcript from EBT of Non-Party Herbert Pinnock 6.7.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #5) Exhibit O - Plaintiffs response to NYCHAs combined demands 3.16.18; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #5) Exhibit N - Order re- motion to strike Note of Issue and summary judgment deadline 9.20.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #5) Exhibit M - Note of Issue 8.27.19; Filed By: Isaac, B.; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Minicucci, L.; Filed: 01/05/2018; Received: 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Gross, O. - filed by Newman Myers Kreines Gross Harris, P.C.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 06/08/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wisell, C. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 05/26/2017; Received: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less