Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 10:00:11 (UTC).

SHELLEY ROBERTS MCRAE et al v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2017 SHELLEY ROBERTS MCRAE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS COMPANY. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel J. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel J. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathryn B. Roberts

Shelley Roberts mcrae and DALE ROBERTS as Co-Executors for the ESTATE of EDWIN E. ROBERTS

Defendants

KENNEDY VALVE MFG. CO. INC.

GARDNER-DENVER, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

CROWN BOILER CO., f/k/a CROWN INDUSTRIES, INC.

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC

BW/IP INC., AND ITS WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARIES, BYRON JACKSON PUMPS

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC. / BENDIX

URS ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION f/k/a Washington Group International, Inc., successor in interest to Raytheon Engineers & Constructors, Inc. and successor in interest to H.K. Ferguson Company

FORT KENT HOLDINGS, INC., f/k/a DUNHAM-BUSH, INC.

WARREN PUMPS LLC

WEIL-MCLAIN, a division of The Marley-Wylain Company

RILEY POWER, INC.

MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, a/k/a 3M COMPANY

BMCE INC., f/k/a UNITED CENTRIFUGAL PUMP

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHUKLA, KUSH

Attorney at Kush Shukla

MEIROWITZ, SAMUEL MILES

Attorney at Meirowitz & Wasserberg, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

WAYNE, EVA S

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

TAMASCO, MATTHEW SCOTT

Attorney at SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

REGINA, GIOVANNI

Attorney at WATERS MCPHERSON MCNEILL

MCHUGH, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at LAVIN, CEDRONE, GRAVER, BOYD & DISIPIO

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

HAAG, SARAH RUTH

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

MERCHANT, JOEL ALEXANDER

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney, Ltd.

Other Attorneys

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

PASCARELLA, LISA M.

Attorney at PASCARELLA DIVITA LINDENBAUM & TOMASZEWSKI

COOK, KERRYANN MARIE

Attorney at The Cook Group, PLLC

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

DAVE, SONIA JANAK

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

BRAUER RUCHALA, HEIDI KAY

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON LLP

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

SQUITIERI, VIRGINIA PAULA

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter to Judge Mendez withdrawing Flowserve's Motion for SJ

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter to Judge Mendez withdrawing Flowserve's Motion for SJ; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 06/23/2020; Received: 06/23/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130

--none--

ORDER ( PROPOSED )

Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT

Flowserve's Memo of Law

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit F - Flowserve's Numerous Requests for Dismissal

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit E - Co-worker Deposition Testimony

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Dep Testimony

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Redacted Answers to Interrogatories

EXHIBIT(S)

Exhibit B - Flowserve's Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

ANSWER Trane U.S. Inc.'s Answer

ANSWER Trane U.S. Inc.'s Answer; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pugliese, D.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ANSWER Answer - Aurora Pump Company

ANSWER Answer - Aurora Pump Company; Filed By: Haag, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Regina, G.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of Defendant A.O. Smith ... show more

ANSWER Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of Defendant A.O. Smith ... show more; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserberg, D.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

239 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter to Judge Mendez withdrawing Flowserve's Motion for SJ; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 06/23/2020; Received: 06/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003); Filed By: Shukla, K.; Filed: 06/08/2020; Received: 06/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) Proposed Order Granting Summary Judgment; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) Flowserve's Memo of Law; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Exhibit F - Flowserve's Numerous Requests for Dismissal; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Exhibit E - Co-worker Deposition Testimony; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Dep Testimony; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Redacted Answers to Interrogatories; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Exhibit B - Flowserve's Answer; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint; Filed By: Sorensen, B.; Filed: 05/18/2020; Received: 05/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Aerco International; Filed By: Dilonardo, A.; Filed: 09/27/2017; Received: 09/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE FW - Acknowledgement of Receipt and Verified Answer; Filed By: Tanenbaum, M.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Lakhani, N.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Trane U.S. Inc.'s Answer; Filed By: Pascarella, L.; Filed: 09/25/2017; Received: 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Pugliese, D.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Squitieri, V.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer - Aurora Pump Company; Filed By: Haag, S.; Filed: 09/22/2017; Received: 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Regina, G.; Filed: 09/19/2017; Received: 09/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgment of Receipt and Adoption of Standard Answer Pleading on behalf of Defendant A.O. Smith Water Products Company; Filed By: Hollman, L.; Filed: 09/14/2017; Received: 09/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserberg, D.; Filed: 09/12/2017; Received: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less