This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 23:32:00 (UTC).

SHELDON METZ v. A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 SHELDON METZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Ark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0371

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John J Ark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheldon Metz and KAY METZ

Defendants

SUPERIOR BOILER WORKS, INC

WEIL-MCLAIN, a division of The Marley-Wylain Company,

A.O. SMITH WATER PRODUCTS CO

KOHLER CO

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY,

PFIZER, INC. (PFIZER),

ALL ACQUISITION, LLC, Individually and

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

UTICA BOILERS, INC.,

U.S. RUBBER COMPANY (UNIROYAL),

AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC.,

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

PNEUMO ABEX LLC, successor in interest

PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC

CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC.,

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Not Yet Classified

Nicoletti & Harris

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DREKSLER, ADAM SEAN

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

GAYOSO, ANDREW JON

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG

FANELLI, MICHAEL PAUL

Attorney at WEITZ & LUXENBERG, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

WAYNE, EVA S

Attorney at MALABY & BRADLEY

POTENZA, V. CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at HURWITZ & FINE, P.C.

GOODEARL, DAVID JAMES

Attorney at LEADER BERKON COLAO & SILVERSTEIN LLP

BLADEL, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott, LLC

HOLLMAN, LAURA B.

Attorney at ECKERT SEAMANS

LAUTENBACH, ELIZABETH MARIE

Attorney at Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas LLP

SAAD, JESSICA

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

GASIOR, JOAN M.

Attorney at Renzulli Law Firm LLP

DEAN, MEAGAN ELIZABETH

Attorney at McGivney, Kluger, Clark & Intoccia, P.C.

YAVITZ, JUDITH A

Attorney at Darger Errante Yavitz & Blau LLP

BROOKS, STEPHEN PHILIP

BRIDGE, CHARLES CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GIBSON, MCASKILL & CROSBY

HUTTNER, BRUCE S.

Attorney at DONOHUE, SABO, VARLEY & HUTTNER LLP

MASINO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

O'ROURKE, PHILIP J

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

NEMETH, MARK STEPHEN

Attorney at FELDMAN KIEFFER, LLP

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Ark on behalf of RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Ark on behalf of RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1) Rheem SJM Adjournment Order

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1) Rheem SJM Adjournment Order; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance (LOC) on behalf of AII Acquisition, LLC

STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance (LOC) on behalf of AII Acquisition, LLC; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C-Interrogatories

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C-Interrogatories; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B-Rheem's Answer

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B-Rheem's Answer; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A-Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A-Complaint; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET

PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Ark on behalf of RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1) Rheem SJM Adjournment Order; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 12/13/2019; Received: 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Partial Discontinuance (LOC) on behalf of AII Acquisition, LLC; Filed By: Dean, M.; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D-Excerpts of Deposition Transcript; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C-Interrogatories; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B-Rheem's Answer; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A-Complaint; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/28/2019; Received: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/25/2019; Received: 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/24/2019; Received: 01/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Klein, G. - filed by Nicoletti & Harris, Inc; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 01/16/2019; Received: 01/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Dreksler, A.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less