Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:47:32 (UTC).

Shawn Fulcher - v. - 56 West LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 Shawn Fulcher filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against 56 West LLC. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Fulcher

Defendants

LNM Construction, LLC

56 West LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOLCHIN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at The Berkman Law Office, LLC

LEITNER, KENNETH ADAM

Attorney at THE BERKMAN LAW OFFICE, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

TSAI, CHANG-HUI

Attorney at Gartner + Bloom

MESSINA, CHRISTINE M

Attorney at GARTNER & BLOOM, P.C.

ANDERSON, ROY MICHAEL

Attorney at Gartner + Bloom, P.C.

SMITH, ARTHUR JOSEPH

Attorney at Baxter Smith & Shapiro PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tsai, C.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 3/27/19

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 3/27/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) REPLY AFFIRMATION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) REPLY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Tsai, C.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 1/30/2019

ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 1/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) GC-Sub Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) GC-Sub Contract; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for a Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for a Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands

DEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LNM Construction, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LNM Construction, LLC; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 56 West, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 56 West, LLC; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Tsai, C.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #2) dtd 3/27/19; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 04/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) REPLY AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Tsai, C.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) dated 1/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3); Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3); Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 01/29/2019; Received: 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #3) Certificate of Merit; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) GC-Sub Contract; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Owner-GC Contract; Filed By: Leitner, K.; Filed: 01/21/2019; Received: 01/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for a Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 07/10/2017; Received: 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Smith, A.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Combined Discovery Demands; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Messina, C. - filed by Gartner Bloom, P.C.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LNM Construction, LLC; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 56 West, LLC; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tolchin, R.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less