This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 19:21:51 (UTC).

SHARI BALABAN - v. - VILLAGE OF GREAT NECK ESTATES

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 SHARI BALABAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VILLAGE OF GREAT NECK ESTATES. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shari Balaban

Defendant

VILLAGE OF GREAT NECK ESTATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAZHDARI, MERGIM

Defendant Attorneys

PATEL, SHEEL D.

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

OCKERT, LILY ANNE

Attorney at Morris Duffy Alonso & Faley

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affirmation of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY

Order with Notice of Entry

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY

--none--

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION

--none--

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Photograph of Accident Location Marked at Plaintiff's Deposition

EXHIBIT(S)

Village Employee Time Sheets

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)

--none--

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY

--none--

ORDER - CERTIFICATION

--none--

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

--none--

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

Request Judicial Intervention (RJI)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service and Legal Back

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

Request Preliminary Conference

ANSWER

answer, demand for bp and combined demands

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service; Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001); Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Bazhdari, M.; Filed: 04/16/2019; Received: 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 03/20/2019; Received: 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Photograph of Accident Location Marked at Plaintiff's Deposition; Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Village Employee Time Sheets; Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Village Clerk/Administrator; Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID); Filed By: Ockert, L.; Filed: 01/10/2019; Received: 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY; Filed By: Bazhdari, M.; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CERTIFICATION; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/06/2018; Received: 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* Request Judicial Intervention (RJI); Filed By: Iemma, J.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service and Legal Back; Filed By: Iemma, J.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Iemma, J.; Filed: 01/11/2018; Received: 01/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER answer, demand for bp and combined demands; Filed By: Patel, S.; Filed: 06/23/2017; Received: 06/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bazhdari, M.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less