This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:08:49 (UTC).

Shahid Chughtai - v. - Sofya Miloslavskaya

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Shahid Chughtai filed an Other lawsuit against Sofya Miloslavskaya. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shahid Chughtai

Defendant

Sofya Miloslavskaya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TUMELTY, JOHN PHILIP

Attorney at Law Office of John Tumelty & Associates

Tumelty, John P

Attorney at Tumelty & Spier, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

YONG, JEFFREY P

Attorney at MARTYN TOHER MARTYN & ROSSI

ZAMYATIN, IRINA

Attorney at Furman, Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Zamyatin, I.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:11/14/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:11/14/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI); Filed By: Zamyatin, I.; Filed: 11/17/2017; Received: 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:11/14/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/16/2017; Received: 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST *Corrected*; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Yong, J.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Tumelty, J. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/27/2017; Received: 06/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tumelty, J.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less