This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 09:57:18 (UTC).

SH575 Holdings LLC v. Reliable Abstract Co., L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 SH575 Holdings LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Reliable Abstract Co , L L C. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter Sherwood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Peter Sherwood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SH575 Holdings LLC

Defendants

TISSA FUNDING, CORP.

MARK CALLER

Reliable Abstract Co., L.L.C.

Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & Gluck P.C.

Jaysukhlal Domadia a/k/a Jay Domadia a/k/a Jay Sukhlal J. Domadia

Pincus David Carlebach

TISSA 16TH CORP

THE MARCAL GROUP LLC

ABC Companies 1-10

Carl Caller

John and jane Does 1-10

Yakov Deckelbaum a/k/a Jacob Deckelbaum

Richmond Stuyvesant Holdings, LLC

HOWARD HERSHKOVICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PROMAN, JONATHAN M

Attorney at Jonathan M. Proman, Esq.

Defendant Attorneys

MEDINETS, DOV BER

Attorney at Gutman Weiss, P.C.

HEINZE, MARK F

Attorney at OFECK & HEINZE, LLP

NEMON, JACOB HERSHEL

Attorney at Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP

JULIUS, RUDI

Attorney at Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & Gluck PC

SIMPSON, PHILIP T.

Attorney at ROBINSON BROG LEINWAND GREENE GENOVESE AND GLUCK

EISENBERG, MICHAEL ALLAN

Attorney at Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & Gluck PC

WIETECHA, ERIN ELIZABETH

Attorney at Law Offices of Erin E. Wietecha

 

Court Documents

ANSWER (AMENDED)

ANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Proposed Bill of Costs

BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Proposed Bill of Costs; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney's Affirmation of Service of Notice of Appeal Upon Pincus David Carlebach

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney's Affirmation of Service of Notice of Appeal Upon Pincus David Carlebach; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 05/13/2020

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal of Order

NOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal of Order; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 05/13/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affirmation of Service for Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affirmation of Service for Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2020; Received: 04/21/2020

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2020; Received: 04/21/2020

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Carl Caller

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Carl Caller; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Yakov Deckelbaum a/k/a Jacob Deckelbaum

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Yakov Deckelbaum a/k/a Jacob Deckelbaum; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese &(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese &(..); Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Richmond Stuyvesant Holdings, LLC

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Richmond Stuyvesant Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Reliable Abstract Co., L.L.C.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Reliable Abstract Co., L.L.C.; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Pincus David Carlebach

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Pincus David Carlebach; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Jaysukhlal Domadia a/k/a Jay Domadia a/k(..)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Jaysukhlal Domadia a/k/a Jay Domadia a/k(..); Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER (AMENDED); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/27/2020; Received: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) Proposed Bill of Costs; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Proposed Judgment; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/26/2020; Received: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney's Affirmation of Service of Notice of Appeal Upon Pincus David Carlebach; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL Notice of Appeal of Order; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 05/13/2020; Received: 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) Affirmation of Service for Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) Notice of Entry of Decision and Order entered on April 21, 2020; Filed By: Nemon, J.; Filed: 05/05/2020; Received: 05/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2020; Received: 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2020; Received: 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/21/2020; Received: 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Wietecha, E.; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Carl Caller; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Yakov Deckelbaum a/k/a Jacob Deckelbaum; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Genovese & Gluck P.C.; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Richmond Stuyvesant Holdings, LLC; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Reliable Abstract Co., L.L.C.; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/27/2019; Received: 03/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Pincus David Carlebach; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/25/2019; Received: 03/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Verified Complaint Upon Jaysukhlal Domadia a/k/a Jay Domadia a/k/a Jay Sukhlal J. Domadia; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Proman, J.; Filed: 02/28/2019; Received: 02/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less