This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:42:52 (UTC).

Severina Cornelio et al - v. - Julio C. Jimenez et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Severina Cornelio filed an Other lawsuit against Julio C Jimenez. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******017E

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicasio Cornelio

Severina Cornelio

Defendants

ABC Corp. I-X said names presently fictitious, true names presently unknown

XYZ Employer I-X said names presently fictitious, true names presently unknown

Abram Davis III

John Doe I-X said names presently fictitious, true names presently unknown

Michael D. Adams

Julio C. Jimenez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALCAGNO, ANDREW J.

Attorney at Calcagno & Associates

Defendant Attorney

BONETA, JOHN EUGEN

Attorney at Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling, Esq.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - OTHER DATED 1/28/20

ORDER - OTHER DATED 1/28/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry

NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/13/2020.

ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/13/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

ORDER - OTHER Dated 07/16/2019

ORDER - OTHER Dated 07/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition and Reply

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition and Reply; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Aff of AJC

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Aff of AJC; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) LOR

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) LOR; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) AOS

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) AOS; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Police Report

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Police Report; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER DATED 1/28/20; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/03/2020; Received: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 1/13/2020.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/29/2020; Received: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 07/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Opposition and Reply; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 05/29/2019; Received: 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Aff of AJC; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) LOR; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) AOS; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Court Minutes; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Police Report; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 03/19/2019; Received: 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer with Cross Claim and Demands; Filed By: Boneta, J. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 02/15/2019; Received: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 01/23/2019; Received: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 01/14/2019; Received: 01/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*; Filed By: Calcagno, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less