Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 15:34:52 (UTC).

Seung Shin Koh - v. - Leopold Weinberger et al

Case Summary

On 05/02/2017 Seung Shin Koh filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Leopold Weinberger. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seung shin Koh

Defendants

Leopold Weinberger

Moshe Halpert

Jin sung Ahn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUNG, URAM WILLIAM

Attorney at Sacco & Fillas, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

ONDROVIC, ROBERT S

Attorney at BOEGGEMAN, CORDE, ONDROVIC & HURLEY, P.C.

NOLAN, LYNNE MARY

Attorney at CARTIGLIA, CONNOLLY & RUSSO

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) WEINBERGER EBT

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) WEINBERGER EBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AHN EBT

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AHN EBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) KOHEBT

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) KOHEBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) pleadings; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit

RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Leopold Weinberger dated 5.11.17

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Leopold Weinberger dated 5.11.17; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Moshe Halpert

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Moshe Halpert; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Jin Sung Ahn

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Jin Sung Ahn; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

MARKED PLEADINGS Discovery Demands

MARKED PLEADINGS Discovery Demands; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 02/07/2019; Received: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 01/09/2019; Received: 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/08/2019; Received: 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/14/2018; Received: 11/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) WEINBERGER EBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) AHN EBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) KOHEBT; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) pleadings; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 09/21/2018; Received: 09/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Cross-Claim; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 10/25/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Nolan, L.; Filed: 10/16/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Leopold Weinberger dated 5.11.17; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 06/02/2017; Received: 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Moshe Halpert; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Deft. Jin Sung Ahn; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/12/2017; Received: 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMARKED PLEADINGS Discovery Demands; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claim; Filed By: Ondrovic, R.; Filed: 05/09/2017; Received: 05/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sung, U.; Filed: 05/02/2017; Received: 05/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less