This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 05:23:58 (UTC).

Seneca Savings v. Longley Jones Telecom Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Seneca Savings filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Longley Jones Telecom Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard J Neri. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2020

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Gerard J Neri

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seneca Savings

Defendants

Longley Jones Telecom Solutions, LLC

Longley Jones Construction Services Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVINE, LOUIS

Attorney at MELVIN & MELVIN

 

Court Documents

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed order

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed order; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

BOND/UNDERTAKING Undertaking

BOND/UNDERTAKING Undertaking; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #3) Service by 9/29, Return Date 10/9 10:00 am

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #3) Service by 9/29, Return Date 10/9 10:00 am; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2020; Received: 09/21/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H H. Fourth Note UCC

EXHIBIT(S) - H H. Fourth Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G G. Fourth Note

EXHIBIT(S) - G G. Fourth Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F F. Third Note UCC

EXHIBIT(S) - F F. Third Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E E. Third Note

EXHIBIT(S) - E E. Third Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D D. Second Note UCC

EXHIBIT(S) - D D. Second Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C C. Second Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C C. Second Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B B. First Note UCC

EXHIBIT(S) - B B. First Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A A. First Note

EXHIBIT(S) - A A. First Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons.Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons.Complaint; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2020; Received: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed order; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 10/07/2020; Received: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE afs; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/25/2020; Received: 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND/UNDERTAKING Undertaking; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/22/2020; Received: 09/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #3) Service by 9/29, Return Date 10/9 10:00 am; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/21/2020; Received: 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1); Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/21/2020; Received: 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I I. CSC Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H H. Fourth Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G G. Fourth Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F F. Third Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E E. Third Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D D. Second Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C C. Second Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B B. First Note UCC; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A A. First Note; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons.Complaint; Filed By: Levine, L.; Filed: 09/14/2020; Received: 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less