This case was last updated from Oneida County Courts on 06/27/2020 at 22:11:36 (UTC).

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC v. STACEY L. PEREZ et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STACEY L PEREZ. This case was filed in Oneida County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are Gerard J Neri and David A Murad. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********0152

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Oneida County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Oneida, New York

Judge Details

Judges

Gerard J Neri

David A Murad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC

Defendants

Jane Doe

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

Forrest R. Boshart-lowe AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BETH BOSHART A/K/A BETH ANN BOSHART

John Doe

Stacey L. Perez AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF BETH BOSHART A/K/A BETH ANN BOSHART

AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BETH BOSHART A/K/A BETH ANN BOSHART

AS EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF BETH BOSHART A/K/A BETH ANN BOSHART

NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

Miles F. Boshart-lowe AS HEIR TO THE ESTATE OF BETH BOSHART A/K/A BETH ANN BOSHART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KATZ, JORDAN S

Attorney at JORDAN S. KATZ AND ASSOCIATES, PC

WEBER-CANTRELL, JACLYN ANN

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

MODICA, TYNE REGINA

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LARKIN, WILLIAM F

Attorney at US ATTORNEYS OFFICE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF N.Y.

ABELOVE, CHARLES LOUIS

Attorney at C. Louis Abelove, Esq.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #02)

JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #02) Attorney Fee Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #02) Attorney Fee Affirmation; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #02) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due

EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #02) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #02) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference

EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #02) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Reference

EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Reference; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Affirmation of Regularity

EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Affirmation of Regularity; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due

EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #02) Affidavit of Service by Mail pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(3)(iii)

EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #02) Affidavit of Service by Mail pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(3)(iii); Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Abelove, C.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #02); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #02) Attorney Fee Affirmation; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #02) Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #02) Notice of Entry of Order of Reference; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #02) Order of Reference; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #02) Affirmation of Regularity; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #02) Affidavit of Merit and Amount Due; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #02) Affidavit of Service by Mail pursuant to CPLR 3215(g)(3)(iii); Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #02) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Modica, T.; Filed: 11/14/2019; Received: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE - JOHN AND JANE DOES; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Abelove, C.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Larkin, W.; Filed: 02/14/2019; Received: 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING-ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Provest; Filed: 02/13/2019; Received: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA - INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/06/2019; Received: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; Filed By: Katz, J. - filed by Large, S.; Filed: 02/05/2019; Received: 02/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Katz, J.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less